Holton, Gordon Raymond (CPSO#: 92657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone: 6133991281
Fax: 6133992464
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kristin R. Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013


Corporation Name: Gordon R. Holton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Holton ( CPSO# 92657 )

Business Address:
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone Number: (613) 399-1281

Business Address:
403 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 0L0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1281

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON RAYMOND HOLTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010