Holub, Darren John (CPSO#: 76440)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4811
Fax: (905) 845-6419
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Wellbeings Pain & Dependency Clinic
185 Plains Road East, Units 1 and 2
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Canada
Phone: (905) 631-9355
Fax: (905) 631-1400
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Horizons Opioid Treatment Service
118 Mill Street, Unit 101
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Canada
Phone: (855) 742-9449
Fax: (855) 742-5300
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren J. Holub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Holub ( CPSO# 76440 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Wellbeings Pain & Dependency Clinic
185 Plains Road East
Suit 1 & 2
Burlington ON  L7T 2C4
Phone Number: (905) 631-9355

Business Address:
Horizons Opioid Treatment Centre
118 Mill Street
Suit 101
Georgetown ON  L7G 2C5
Phone Number: (855) 742-9449

Business Address:
CMHA Halton
Suite 102
1540 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 693-4270

Business Address:
ADAPT Halton
203 - 165 Cross Avenue
Oakville ON  L6J 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 847-6548

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN JOHN HOLUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLUB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2008