Homat, Arman (CPSO#: 96788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone: (647) 677-7933
Fax: (647) 933-0199
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arman Homat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Homat ( CPSO# 96788 )

Business Address:
207-7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone Number: (647) 677-7933

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Sep 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Sep 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Arman Homat may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine, only.