Honein, Elias Farid (CPSO#: 22395)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999