Hoo Sang, Mark (CPSO#: 85451)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2006 to 29 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Oct 2009