Hooper, Jonathan George Victor (CPSO#: 62826)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Civic Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hooper ( CPSO# 62826 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4167

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN GEORGE VICTOR HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1990