Hooshangi, Hedieh (CPSO#: 83913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site
Department of Anaesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 284-8131
Fax: (416) 281-7453
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North Toronto Endoscopy
7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

GTA Endoscopy
305 Milner Ave
Scarborough ON  M1B 0A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-3883
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery
1940 Eglinton Ave east
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-5222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Crescent Oral Surgery
9251 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9T3
Canada
Phone: (905) 889-8006
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Vaughan Endoscopy
4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 516-2656
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Promenad Endoscopy
1315 Finch Ave west
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Downsview Endoscopy Clinic
1635 Lawrence Ave west, unit 201
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Upper Canada Lower Bowel Clinic
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 926-0262
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hedi Hooshangi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kashanian ( CPSO# 82136 )
Dr. H. Hooshangi ( CPSO# 83913 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Centenary Site - Dept of Anaesthesia
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4C 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
920 - 305 Milner Avenue
Markham ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1

Business Address:
Suite 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
201 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3

Business Address:
400 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7


Corporation Name: Behnam Kashanian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kashanian ( CPSO# 82136 )
Dr. H. Hooshangi ( CPSO# 83913 )

Business Address:
305 Milner Avenue
Suite 920
Toronto ON  M1B 3V4
Phone Number: (905) 856-2626

Business Address:
201 - 1635 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6L 3C9
Phone Number: (416) 630-7388

Business Address:
131 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M5S 1R1
Phone Number: (416) 929-2020

Business Address:
203 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 754-2022

Business Address:
301 - 100 Front Street West
Toronto ON  M5J 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 834-6640

Business Address:
400 - 145 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 451-5855

Business Address:
211 - 300 York Mills Road
Toronto ON  M1N 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 391-4452

Business Address:
301 - 2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
400 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 926-0262

Business Address:
211 - 330 York Regional Road 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
201 - 1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-2577

Business Address:
500 - 1940 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 4R1
Phone Number: (416) 752-5222

Business Address:
302-1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 633-9420

Business Address:
3585 Keele Street
North York ON  M3J 3H5

Business Address:
200 - 4610 Hwy 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (416) 634-0001

Business Address:
Suite 1401
123 Edwards Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Business Address:
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9
Phone Number: (647) 729-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEDIEH HOOSHANGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSHANGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 15 Feb 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 16 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Feb 2007
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008