Hope, Kim Carol (CPSO#: 78608)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005