Hopkins, Jessica Patricia (CPSO#: 80671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Public Health
7120 Hurontario Street, 7th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5M 2C2
Phone: 905-799-7700 Ext. 2628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Limeridge Medical Centre
Suite 205
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Canada
Phone: (905) 318-0303
Fax: (905) 318-3050
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA PATRICIA HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2009