Horne, Pamela Ellen (CPSO#: 97086)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 04 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 13 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2018