Horowitz, Glenda Alison (CPSO#: 81583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction& Mental Health
1001 Queen Street West
Complex Mental Health
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32679
Fax: (416) 583-1262
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

418 - 220 Duncan Mill Rd
Toronto ON  M3B 3J5
Canada
Phone: (647) 972-5011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Glenda A. Horowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENDA ALISON HOROWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOROWITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011