Horvath, Ilana Sarah (CPSO#: 96079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ILANA SARAH HORVATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORVATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013