Hosein, Alana Nicole (CPSO#: 82409)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1
Phone: (905) 820-3633
Fax: (905) 820-3352
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alana Hosein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hosein ( CPSO# 82409 )

Business Address:
2207 Dunwin Drive
Mississauga ON  L5L 1X1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANA NICOLE HOSEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 02 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012