Hosein, Maryam (CPSO#: 95296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4169786976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARYAM HOSEIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. HOSEIN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. HOSEIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. HOSEIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. HOSEIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. HOSEIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. HOSEIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019