Hoselton, Stacey Lynn (CPSO#: 94146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
Department of Family Medicine
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Feb 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY LYNN HOSELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOSELTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Aug 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014