Hosseini Moghaddam, Seyed Mohammadmehdi (CPSO#: 92031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:BABOL UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
B9-123
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3840
Fax: (519) 646-6197
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seyed Hosseini-Moghaddam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Aghel ( CPSO# 94670 )
Dr. S. Hosseini Moghaddam ( CPSO# 92031 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Suite B3-420
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 663-3840

Business Address:
University Hospital
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Infectious Diseases Effective: 29 Nov 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 18 Nov 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 2011 to 01 Jan 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 31 May 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Seyed Mohammadmehdi Hosseini Moghaddam may practise medicine independently
            in infectious diseases.