Hotz, Jeffrey Alan (CPSO#: 55386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
645 E. Missouri Avenue
Phoenix AZ  85012
United States
Phone: (602) 262-8900

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ALAN HOTZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOTZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 07 Jul 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1986