Houlden, Robyn Leslie (CPSO#: 52937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3 Room 4 - 3-225
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-1379
Fax: (613) 548-6105
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robyn Houlden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Houlden ( CPSO# 52937 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Watkins 3, Room 4 - 3-225
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-1379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBYN LESLIE HOULDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOULDEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1986