Housawi, Abdulrahman Abdulkarim A (CPSO#: 78522)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 09 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2003 to 09 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2004 to 09 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2005 to 09 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Sep 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006