Hovhannisyan, Gayane (CPSO#: 91274)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Yerevan State Medical University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2201 St. David's Road
Thorold ON  L2V 0A2
Phone: 905-688-3762
Fax: 905-682-3901
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2340 Dundas St. W
Toronto ON  M6P 4A9
Canada
Phone: 4163920999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYANE HOVHANNISYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOVHANNISYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2014