Howe, Kathryn Leigh (CPSO#: 88811)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
6EN-220
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5193
Fax: 416-340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Howe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Howe ( CPSO# 88811 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
6EN-220
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN LEIGH HOWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018