Howey, Joanne Margaret (CPSO#: 95088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London X-Ray Associates
104 - 450 Central Ave
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-7900
Fax: (519) 672-8731
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne Howey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Howey ( CPSO# 95088 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Four Counties Health Services
R.R. #3, 1827 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Business Address:
Hanover & District Hospital
90 - 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1
Phone Number: (519) 364-2340

Business Address:
Listowel Memorial Hospital
255 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4W 2P5
Phone Number: (519) 291-3120

Business Address:
Wingham & District Hospital
270 Carling Trace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-3688

Business Address:
104 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-5270

Business Address:
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 657-8246

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 913-7900

Business Address:
1657 Dundas Street East
London ON  N5W 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 659-4158

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 1H1
Phone Number: (519) 438-8131

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6035

Business Address:
Chesley Hospital
39-2nd Street S.E.
Chesley ON  N0L 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 363-2340

Business Address:
Durham Hospital
Box 638
320 College Street
Durham ON  N0G 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 369-2340

Business Address:
Kincardine Hospital
43 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Business Address:
Walkerton Hospital
Box 1300
21 McGivern Street West
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1220

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Business Address:
Southwest Middlesex Health Care
R.R. #5, 22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Business Address:
Stittsville Imaging Centre
1609 Stittsville Main
Ottawa ON  K2S 1N6
Phone Number: (519) 613-7141

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-1550

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 18 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE MARGARET HOWEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 12 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 29 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Sep 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017