Hronsky, Ivan (CPSO#: 23680)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 02 Apr 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2018

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Apr-2018

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, German, Hebrew, Hungarian, Italian, Slovak

Education:University of Comenius, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 02 Apr 2018