Hsiao, Janey Shih Chi (CPSO#: 75141)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137985555 Ext. 71286
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janey Hsiao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hsiao ( CPSO# 75141 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5847

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
5th Floor SE Wing
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6118

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANEY SHIH CHI HSIAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSIAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2005 to 06 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005