Hsieh, Victar Wai Tat (CPSO#: 96547)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Aug 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 17 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012