Hsu, Katherine Eva (CPSO#: 78309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 - 3825 Sunset Street
Burnaby BC  V5G 1T4
Phone: (604) 568-5026
Fax: (604) 568-5027

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE EVA HSU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HSU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006