Huang, Alexander Francis (CPSO#: 95751)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3 E N - 435
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3242
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Huang ( CPSO# 95751 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
3 Eaton North, Suite 435
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3242

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER FRANCIS HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2016