Huang, Dennis Chia Nan (CPSO#: 32012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Apr 2005

Summary

Date of Death: 27-Sep-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Apr 2005