Huang, Virgil Yao-Feng (CPSO#: 94654)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin, Taiwanese

Education:Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cassandra Clinic
2044-2048 Victoria Park Avenue
North York ON  M1R 1V2
Phone: (416) 331-9111
Fax: (416) 331-9050
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Virgil Y. Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Huang ( CPSO# 94654 )

Business Address:
Suite 2044
2048 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M1R 1V2
Phone Number: (416) 331-9111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Taiwan
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Virgil  Yao-Feng Huang may practise medicine independently in office-based
            paediatrics, only.