Huang, Vivian Wai-Mei (CPSO#: 86185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 445
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2475
Fax: 416-586-4655
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Huang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Huang ( CPSO# 86185 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
445-600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN WAI-MEI HUANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2017