Huda, Noureen (CPSO#: 88986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Room UH B9 105
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33024
Fax: 5196632908
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Huda Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Huda ( CPSO# 88986 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
339 Windermere Road
Room B9 105
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOUREEN HUDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012