Hudson, Christopher Charles Craig (CPSO#: 79147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital - UHN
200 Elisabeth Street, 3EN-438
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

CAMH
1001 Queen St W
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hudson ( CPSO# 79147 )

Business Address:
610 University Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
66 Avenue Road #4
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8

Business Address:
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2

Business Address:
Suite 3EN-438
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHARLES CRAIG HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2009