Huffman, David Arthur William John (CPSO#: 75020)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone: (519) 352-3210
Fax: (519) 352-2176
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David A. Huffman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Huffman ( CPSO# 75020 )

Business Address:
34 Wellington Street East
Chatham ON  N7M 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 354-3113

Business Address:
465 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1C5
Phone Number: (519) 352-3210

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B7
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARTHUR WILLIAM JOHN HUFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2002