Hughes, Brendan James (CPSO#: 71758)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
150 Strickland Street, Suite 1
Douro ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 651-0502
Fax: (705) 651-0503
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Lakield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Canada
Phone: (705) 652-7112
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brendan Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hughes ( CPSO# 71758 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
150 Strickland Road
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 651-0502

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Lakefield Extendicare
19 Fraser Street
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 655-7112

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDAN JAMES HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999