Hui, Catherine May Ting (CPSO#: 92974)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Ottawa Eye Associates 2nd Floor 1 Centrepointe Drive Ottawa, Ontario K2G 6E2 Tel: (613) 226-8872
Date Received: 06 Mar 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2011