Hui, Melody (CPSO#: 93973)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone: (416) 920-4200
Fax: (416) 920-4204
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown, ON
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905 873 0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2
Canada
Phone: 4166461890
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melody Hui Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hui ( CPSO# 93973 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
421 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 920-4200

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
60 Carlton Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1J2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELODY HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012