Huidovici, Elia (CPSO#: 83919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, French, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
202-3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone: (519) 258-3478
Fax: (519) 946-3435
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elia Huidovici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Huidovici ( CPSO# 83919 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 258-3478

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIA HUIDOVICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUIDOVICI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007