Hulley, Susan Jacqueline (CPSO#: 65576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jun 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
309 Cooper Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 0G5
Phone: (613) 282-4427
Fax: (613) 288-9242
Electoral District: 07

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Jun 2009 Active View Details [+]

            As from June 15, 2009, at 22:00 hours, the following is imposed as a term,
            condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Susan
            Jacqueline Hulley, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Hulley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                  I, Dr. Susan Jacqueline Hulley, have voluntarily relinquished my
                  prescribing privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances
                  and preparations set out in Schedules I through IV of the Controlled
                  Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c. 19, as amended, and related
                  regulations (the "Act"), and summarized as follows
                  
                  Drug/Substance          Relinquished       Not Relinquished
                  
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs                x                                    
                  Narcotic Preparations         x                  
                  Controlled Drugs                                             x     
                  Benzodiazepines/Other
                  Targeted Substances                                    x