Hummel, David Brian (CPSO#: 57703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 733-7772
Fax: (416) 224-9880
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 103E
4581 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Canada
Phone: (905) 479-9693
Fax: (905) 415-1371
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 8623
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hummel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hummel ( CPSO# 57703 )

Business Address:
103E - 4581 Highway #7
Markham ON  L3R 1M6
Phone Number: (905) 479-9693

Business Address:
301 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M5M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 733-7772

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 24 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BRIAN HUMMEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMMEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1986