Humphrey, Shannon Deirdre (CPSO#: 83590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: Hanna, Shannon Deirdre (used until: 12 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON DEIRDRE HUMPHREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2005 to 09 Sep 2005
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2008 to 25 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2018