Humphreys, Joanna Sarah (CPSO#: 95511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Services
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA SARAH HUMPHREYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUMPHREYS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2015