Humpl, Tilman Friedrich (CPSO#: 72709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Feb 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4918
Fax: (416) 813-7299
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Feb 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tilman Friedrich Humpl may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,  University  of  Toronto,  in which Dr. Humpl holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirement of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr. Humpl no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.