Hunchak, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 85302)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Schwartz Reisman Emergency Medicine
Centre
600 University Avenue Rm 206
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Hunchak & D. Sood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hunchak ( CPSO# 85302 )
Dr. D. Sood ( CPSO# 82736 )

Business Address:
Suite B101
726 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6G 4A1
Phone Number: (647) 350-5445

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph & Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
Department of Emergency Medicine
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1L4
Phone Number: (416) 586-5054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN HUNCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNCHAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009