Hunt, Barry Herbert (CPSO#: 56545)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2018