Hunt, Dereck Leslie (CPSO#: 65122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H H S
Henderson General Site
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 318-9084
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-318-9084
Fax: 905-575-7320
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dereck Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hunt ( CPSO# 65122 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8Z 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 318-9084

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 318-9084

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DERECK LESLIE HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993