Hunt, George Denys (CPSO#: 23160)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denys Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 7 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: West Parry Sound Health Centre at (705) 746-9321 ask for Health Records Dept.
Date Received: 22 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 2014