Huntington, Katrina Deanne (CPSO#: 72574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1804
Highway 2E
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 341-2870
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katrina Huntington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Huntington ( CPSO# 72574 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
Suite 1250
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATRINA DEANNE HUNTINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNTINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2004