Huot, Philippe (CPSO#: 89409)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013