Hurmatov, Tetyana Yaremivna (CPSO#: 94532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Oct 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Ivano-Frankivsk State Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
448 Welland Ave Unit 3
St Catharines ON  L2N 7V3
Phone: (905) 688-2000
Fax: (905) 688-2008
Electoral District: 04

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 11 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 May 2018

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Hurmatov’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Hurmatov is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in her care of patients, including in her prescribing. It is also alleged that Dr. Hurmatov engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, including by writing prescriptions in the name of her clinic for her own use and/or which she used, and treating herself between approximately 2011 and 2017, including prescriptions for and treatment with narcotics and controlled substances; writing prescriptions for and treating family members between approximately 2011 and 2017; and failing to document her prescribing and treatment of family members.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 07 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 7, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Tetyana Yaremivna
            Hurmatov in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hurmatov to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. TETYANA YAREMIVNA HURMATOV
                                          ("Dr. Hurmatov")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, certificate of registration number 94532, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, in the matters of College File Numbers 7216326 and
                  7215589, allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice
                  and/or am incompetent, including in my prescribing, and that I engaged in
                  disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in treating and
                  prescribing to myself and family members. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, have read the Notice of Hearing dated April 11, 2018,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.
            (5)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that the ICR Committee has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code at
                  this time.

            (6)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I previously entered into an
                  undertaking with the College on October 11, 2017 (the "October 2017
                  Undertaking").  Pursuant to the October 2017 Undertaking, I resigned my
                  prescribing privileges for Narcotic Drugs and Narcotic Substances.  I
                  understand that this Undertaking replaces and supercedes the October 2017
                  Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that this Undertaking does not preclude the
                  ICR Committee from making an order at a later date in accordance with the
                  Code. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are finally disposed of by a panel
                  of the Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING 

            (9)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (10)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake and agree that, effective immediately, I will
                  not issue any new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for
                  myself, my clinic, or any member of my family or others close to me for
                  any medication.  

            (11)  Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, consent to the College sending the Resignation
                        Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions
                        or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to immediately send a notice to all
                        patients to whom I am currently prescribing any of the substances
                        described in section (11)(c)(iii) - (v), above, and to promptly
                        transfer care of these patients to other health care professionals
                        in accordance with their instructions.  I confirm that, pursuant to
                        the October 2017 Undertaking, I was no longer able to prescribe the
                        substances described in section (11)(c)(i) and (11)(c)(ii) and,
                        therefore, do not have patients to whom I am currently prescribing
                        those substances. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to keep a log of all patients to whom I
                        send the notice referred to above in section (11)(d) (the "Log").
                        I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to include in the Log the name of each
                        patient notified, the name of the professional to whom care has
                        been transferred, and the date on which this occurred. 
                  
            (12)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will return any supplies of the
                  substances referred to in section (11)(c) above that are presently in my
                  possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as
                  stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (13)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (14)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "E."  For further clarity, this sign shall
                        state as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE 
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following: 
                  
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (14)(a) in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (14)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (14)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (14)(d).
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that in the event of an appeal of any Order
                  of the Discipline Committee, if the Discipline Committee has directed the
                  Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that Order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (17)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or colleague(s) with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (18)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (19)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (21)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (22)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (22)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of failing to maintain the
                              standard of practice and/or incompetence, including in her
                              prescribing, and of engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or
                              unprofessional conduct in treating and prescribing to herself
                              and family members. 
                  
                              As a result of the referral: 

                              Dr. Hurmatov must not issue new prescriptions or renew
                              existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22);     

                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov must post a clearly visible sign in all waiting
                              rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms in all Practice
                              Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the
                              following:
                  
                              -     Narcotic Drugs
                              -     Narcotic Preparations
                              -     Controlled Drugs
                              -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                              -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (23)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
                  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by
                  the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in
                  order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (24)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (25)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                  consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G",
                  respectively.

            (26)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any
                  information arising from monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (27)  I, Dr. Hurmatov, give my irrevocable consent to all Chief(s) of Staff to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tetyana Yaremivna Hurmatov to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective May 7, 2018:

Dr. Hurmatov is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of failing to maintain the standard of practice and/or incompetence, including in her prescribing, and of engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in treating and prescribing to herself and family members.

As a result of the referral:

Dr. Hurmatov must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Hurmatov must post a clearly visible sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Hurmatov must not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca