Hurtubise, Andre Leandre (CPSO#: 22060)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre de Sante Communautaire Temiskaming 20 May St S PO Box 38 New Liskeard, ON P0J 1P0
Date Received: 02 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018